Accounts and annual returns WORLD EDUCATION BERKSHIRE

Charity number: 293799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 20 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 09 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 08 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 01 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 08 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window