Financial history ABRAR ISLAMIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 293802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £293.96k £268.74k £267.14k £296.88k £314.28k
Total expenditure £415.97k £410.00k £423.19k £457.87k £452.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A