ABRAR ISLAMIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Establishing an information and research centre or information devoted to the study and dissemination of Muslim Shia Ithna-Ashari thought and educational needs of Muslims in the United Kingdom
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 February 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
abdulsamee albahbahani | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fadel Safar | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADEL ALYOSIFI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr saeed shehabi | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr MUSTAFA AL-MOSAWI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £293.96k | £268.74k | £267.14k | £296.88k | £314.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £415.97k | £410.00k | £423.19k | £457.87k | £452.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH FEBRUARY 1986 as amended on 28 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE MUSLIM SHIA ITHNA-ASHARI FAITH: AND 1.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RELATION TO THE MUSLIM SHIA ITHNA-ASHARI FAITH AND MATTERS AFFECTING THE GLOBAL MUSLIM COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 CRAWFORD PLACE
LONDON
W1H 4LP
- Phone:
- 02077243033
- Email:
- abrarhouse@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window