THE GERRARDS CROSS CE SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for the Gerrards Cross Cof E School. Moreland drive, by way of events involving Parents Children and Teachers.The PTA run several events per year including The Christmas fair, Quiz night, Easter Hamper raffle , Party in the Playground, Ball.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 06 March 1986: Standard registration
- GERRARDS CROSS CHURCH OF ENGLAND COMBINED SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nisha Kudhail | Chair | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harpreet Virk | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nina Kumar | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Athena Couvaras | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Fundell | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.36k | £18.43k | £15.58k | £53.93k | £43.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.68k | £46.08k | £7.24k | £48.58k | £27.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH JULY 1985 AS AMENDED ON 09/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gerrards Cross C Of E School
Moreland Drive
GERRARDS CROSS
Buckinghamshire
SL9 8BD
- Phone:
- 01753 882731
- Email:
- gxschoolpta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window