THE PAUL VANDER MOLEN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 1986: Standard registration
- 09 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH FEBRUARY 1986
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY MEANS OF ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM LEUKAEMIA AND ITS RELAED CONDITIONS. (2) TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST RESEARCH INTO LEUKAEMIA AND ITS RELATED CONDITIONS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED. (3) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN GEOGRAPHICAL SCIENCE AND GEOLOGICAL SCIENCE. (4) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELAFER FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR DISABLEMENT. (5) TO ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OFTHE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES OF YOUNG AND DISABLED PERSONS SO THAT THEY MAY FULFIL THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window