League of Friends of the Adelaide

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs a small shop within the Adelaide complex to provide elderly and disabled clients the opportunity of personally purchasing small everyday items and treats. It also holds raffles and competitions with proceeds helping to purchase little luxuries such as televisions for bedrooms, regular live entertainers and Christmas presents and treats for the clients resident at Christmas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 01 April 1986: Standard registration
- League of Friends of the Adelaide (Working name)
- ADELAIDE - RYDE (Previous name)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ADELAIDE CLUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN KEITH HARRIS | Chair | 24 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Ratsey-Woodroffe | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.87k | £952 | £900 | £1.52k | £1.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £1.89k | £3.98k | £2.47k | £2.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED 30TH NOVEMBER 1995 as amended on 20 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AGED AND DISABLED PERSONS RESIDENT AT OR ATTENDING THE ADELAIDE RYDE BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
RYDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Firestone Glade
Wootton Bridge
Ryde
PO33 4LH
- Phone:
- 01983882620
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window