ORTHODOX PARISH OF SAINT JOHN THE THEOLOGIAN, IN NORWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conduct religious services in the rites of the Eastern Orthodox Church. Provide the related pastoral services, education and spiritual guidance. Primary Missionary area Norwich and Norfolk UK as Members of The UK Deanery of Great Britain and Ireland of the Ecumenical Patriachate Archdiocese of Orthodox Parishes of Russian Tradition in Western Europe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 January 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN TERENCE SADOWSKI SRCH MSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Artur Topal | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP John Shakespeare | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WHITNEY | Trustee | 30 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.65k | £1.12k | £1.40k | £1.23k | £1.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £1.90k | £3.09k | £2.46k | £1.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ORTHODOX PARISH OF SAINT JOHN THE THEOLOGIAN IN NORWICH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
219 UNTHANK ROAD
NORWICH
NR2 2PH
- Phone:
- 07555946436
- Email:
- jxnparis@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window