Accounts and annual returns SANDOWN AND SHANKLIN LIONS' CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 293843
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required