Financial history LOAF PROJECT

Charity number: 293855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.09k £1.42k £39.80k £100 £100
Total expenditure £10.27k £250 £39.26k £3.25k £275
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A