BURNHAM GREEN VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold the Village Hall upon trust for the people of Burnham Green for the purposes of recreation, social, moral and intellectual development, entertainment, or other activities decided upon by the committee, for the benetfit of the inhabitants of Burnham Green. Burnham Green is defined as being within half a mile of the crossroads at Burnham Green, Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 September 1986: Standard registration
- BURNHAM GREEN VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Tyler | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Kenworthy | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mark Truran | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alfred Jerome Gaskin | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Carter | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Patricia Bishop | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Sims | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Susannah Briggs | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE GASKIN | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN TYLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM GEORGE TEBBUTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.98k | £13.63k | £6.74k | £15.02k | £13.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.32k | £9.01k | £8.21k | £14.95k | £10.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 15TH OCTOBER 1953
Charitable objects
PROPERTY TO BE HELD IN TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING, RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE FOR BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS LIVING WITHIN HALF A MILE RADIUS OF BURNHAM GREEN CROSS ROADS.
Area of benefit
BURNHAM GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Burnham Close
WELWYN
Hertfordshire
AL6 0PE
- Phone:
- 01438798686
- Website:
-
burnhamgreen.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window