THE FRIENDS OF THE CHILDREN'S TRUST AT TADWORTH COURT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of the Children's Trust engages in fundraising activities to generate money which is donated to The Children's Trust to enhance the lives of the children at Tadworth Court.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 March 1986: Standard registration
- 23 September 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 23 September 2024: Funds transferred to 288018 THE CHILDREN'S TRUST
- FRIENDS OF TADWORTH COURT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE CHILDREN'S TRUST AT TADWORTH COURT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.68k | £4.49k | £21.32k | £5.97k | £5.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.43k | £6.09k | £3.10k | £12.87k | £7.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OBJECT AND RULES ADOPTED 18TH FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED 6TH JULY 1994 AND 21 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT IS FOR THE CARE, TREATMENT, REHABILITATION AND RELIEF OF SICK, PHYSICALLY AND MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND OTHER PERSONS AND THE PREVENTION OF ILLNESS, DISABILITY, DISEASE AND INFIRMITY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO THE CHILDRENãS TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window