FAMILY IN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's main activity continues to be the promotion of care and welfare of children and adults who have suffered from the effects of mental or physical handicap or social deprivation. Family in Trust seeks to encourage the work of Jeanette Roberts as she continues to give support and care to many who have been abandoned or marginalised by society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £59,652 from 10 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 19 March 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN SPRECKLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Miriam Jane Lantsbury | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alan Lantsbury | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GREEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW BARKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £337.20k | £204.73k | £115.73k | £208.22k | £255.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.51k | £110.71k | £99.14k | £179.55k | £208.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £72.00k | £78.00k | £73.37k | £67.40k | £59.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED 20TH SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMTE THE CARE AND MATERIAL EDUCATIONAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO ARE SUFFERING OR WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM THE EFFECTS OF MENTAL AND OR PHYSICAL HANDICAP SOCIAL DEPRIVATION AND DELINQUENCY AND EXPOSURE TO MORAL DANGERS AND WHO ARE OTHERWISE DISADVANTAGED OR AT RISK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 HAY GREEN
DANBURY
CHELMSFORD
CM3 4NU
- Phone:
- 01245222874
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window