Financial history WARDEN BAY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 293868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.84k £21.53k £22.75k £14.78k £11.37k
Total expenditure £11.67k £13.57k £15.17k £18.71k £18.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A