Trustees WARDEN BAY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 293868

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL FREDERICK RUMBOL | Chair | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Derek Warner | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Rumbol | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Crawford | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Tatton | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOE RUMBOL | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA SANDLE | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ROY STARLING | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.