CLEVELAND BAY HORSE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote all that is best in the Cleveland Bay horse. To preserve, develop and strengthen the breed for future generations to enjoy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 March 1986: Standard registration
- CLEVELAND BAY HORSE SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire O'Connell | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cracknell | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Brown | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kirk | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Wylie | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Margaret Lea | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Keith | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norma Wilson | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.61k | £40.39k | £38.95k | £42.93k | £43.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.30k | £32.44k | £46.14k | £58.02k | £41.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 April 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 16 April 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/01/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
1 TO ENCOURAGE THE BREEDING AND IMPROVEMENT OF HORSES, PARTICULARLY THE CLEVELAND BAY. 2 TO IMPROVE THE GENERAL STANDARDS IN THE MANAGEMENT, USE AND TREATMENT OF HORSES GENERALLY AND OF THE CLEVELAND BAY HORSE IN PARTICULAR BY FACILITATING THE DISTRIBUTION AND ACQUISITION OF KNOWLEDGE AND LEARNING AMONG BREEDERS, OWNERS, JUDGES, VETERINARIANS, TRAINERS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC; AND 3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, THROUGH THE USE OF HORSES, BUT CONFINED TO FACILITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE MEANING AND SO AS TO SATISFY THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958 4 TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO AND PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF HORSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cleveland Bay Horse Society
PO Box 298
CROOK
County Durham
DL14 4GT
- Phone:
- 07895535147
- Email:
- clevelandbayoffice@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window