SARRATT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As per area of operation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 March 1986: Standard registration
- SARRATT W I (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Wade | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Youell | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Virginia McNamara | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Baker | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Mason | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Leone Ashby | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Kay Scott | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Powers | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Miles | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.03k | £660 | £2.74k | £5.57k | £5.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.08k | £587 | £2.17k | £6.77k | £6.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTRUCTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE TO WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION, AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
SARRATT
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 The Briars
Sarratt
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 6AU
- Phone:
- 01923261990
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window