THE MILVERTON VICTORIA ROOMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a village hall for the Parish of Milverton, including lettings management, fund-raising and seeking grant funding for capital expenditure for building improvements. We actively encourage new activities that might appeal to residents, e.g. computer, keep-fit, literature and theatrical events, as well as promoting the village hall as a centre for community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 09 April 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin David Gorton | Chair | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Heald | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Hatfield | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca BEARD | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel ROSSITER | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Elson | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Christopher Pine | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP KNOWLES | Trustee |
|
||||||
SALLY ACKLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDSAY FORTUNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.71k | £22.12k | £10.92k | £13.81k | £12.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.17k | £15.64k | £15.47k | £16.05k | £12.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.67k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE US OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MILVERTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MILVERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Milverton
Victoria Rooms
Fore Street
Milverton
TAUNTON
TA4 1JU
- Phone:
- 07880702609
- Website:
-
milverton.org.uk/victoria-rooms
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window