THE LIVING WATERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the trust are (1) To advance the Christian faith. (2) To give help to those who suffer as a result of their faith. (3) To bring help to the disadvantaged, particularly overseas, by supporting schools and community projects and by helping with disaster relief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- India
- Niger
- South Africa
Governance
- 02 April 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CORNELIS JOHANNUS VAN DEN BROEK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adriaan van den Broek | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.78k | £37.04k | £64.09k | £36.80k | £394.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.50k | £41.80k | £61.00k | £25 | £409.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3RD MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE CONSENT OF THE SETTLOR DURING HIS LIFE SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND AFTER HIS DEATH AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FOM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINCLUDEN
ROWTOWN
ADDLESTONE
KT15 1HH
- Phone:
- 01932840646
- Email:
- cjvdb@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window