VIRGINIA WATER COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre school provision for children in the community aged 2 1/2 to school age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 April 1986: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 January 2011: Standard registration
- 12 August 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- VIRGINIA WATER COMMUNITY PRESCHOOL (Working name)
- VIRGINIA WATER PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- VIRGINIA WATER PLAYSCHOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.07k | £104.49k | £113.93k | £110.28k | £140.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.52k | £125.75k | £106.30k | £114.68k | £132.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 25 January 2016 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 23 October 2015 | 115 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 08 July 2014 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 08 July 2014 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 19 July 2013 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 19 July 2013 | 19 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 17TH JULY 1987
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY:- (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART; (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN; (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window