Financial history THE HOMESTEAD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 293979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £84.68k £55.24k £40.33k £125.24k £232.11k
Total expenditure £270.73k £46.01k £45.56k £13.92k £13.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A