Financial history THE VALLEY TRUST

Charity number: 293983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £223.66k £249.92k £199.57k £508.09k £419.10k
Total expenditure £215.13k £249.45k £202.23k £521.23k £420.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £507.52k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £575 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £517.86k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £3.37k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £3.30k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £25.40k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £616 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A