THE DORCHESTER ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH INTO LOCAL HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY

Charity number: 293998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Research into local history and archaeology

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £2,253
Total expenditure: £2,091

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 April 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE DORCHESTER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janice Tollerfield Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
Michael Rice Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
JEAN LAWSON Trustee 03 November 2011
None on record
ALEC BAILEY Trustee 01 January 2000
VOLUNTEER CENTRE DORSET
Received: On time
ALEC BAILEY MA, FCA Trustee
DORSET COUNTY MUSEUM MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
BRIDPORT AND WEST DORSET SPORTS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ANTHONY JOHN GOULD Trustee
None on record
DOUG LAZENBY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.95k £886 £1.26k £1.57k £2.25k
Total expenditure £2.49k £838 £1.86k £1.48k £2.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 June 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GREENACRES
WINTERBOURNE ABBAS
DORCHESTER
DT2 9LJ
Phone:
01305889454