THE MOBBS MEMORIAL FUND CHARITABLE TRUST (1985)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was established to encourage the playing of rugby football (or such other games to promote physical education and development) amongst young people aged under 21 years in the East Midlands Rugby Football Union area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 04 April 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Franklin | Chair | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hamilton | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Mobbs | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Essington Stonor | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ella Bevan | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Reynolds | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Miles | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY IRVINE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BAINBRIDGE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £779 | £5.50k | £9.98k | £6.34k | £414 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.36k | £7.00k | £6.89k | £9.40k | £12.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1986
Charitable objects
1. THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF THE FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PUPILS AND STUDENTS AT SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER PLACES OF HIGHER EDUCATION IN THE AREA ADMINISTERED BY THE EAST MIDLANDS RUGBY UNION TO PLAY RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL OR OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS SO AS TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PUPILS AND STUDENTS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS. 2. THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION IN THE AREA ADMINISTERED BY THE EAST MIDLANDS RUGBY UNION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE PROVIDED) FOR PERSONS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 21 YEARS AND WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
AREA ADMINISTERED BY THE EAST MIDLANDS RUGBY UNION
Contact information
- Address:
-
7A The Green
Orlingbury
Kettering
Northants
NN14 1JA
- Phone:
- 01933400123
- Email:
- steve.miles@emru.co.uk
- Website:
-
notapplicable.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window