Financial history THE CHELTENHAM MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 294042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.81k £31.22k £42.60k £48.91k £159.87k
Total expenditure £25.66k £25.43k £26.01k £55.73k £101.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A