HACKNEY COOPERATIVE DEVELOPMENT TRUST LTD

Charity number: 294048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance education through the promotion and coordination of research, to provide or assist in the provision of vocational training and to advise or assist in the establishment of cooperative and common ownership enterprises amongst the inhabitants of and persons in need in the London Borough of Hackney

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,032
Total expenditure: £2,768

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HCDT (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthonia Onigbode Trustee 31 July 2024
FINSBURY PARK TRUST
Received: On time
LIVING GRACE TRUST INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
RODERICK CAMPBELL-TAYLOR Trustee
None on record
PETER OTTINO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £75 £31.70k £6.58k £11.66k £1.03k
Total expenditure £72 £30.77k £6.74k £8.79k £2.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.18k N/A £11.39k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
62 BEECHWOOD ROAD
LONDON
E8 3DY
Phone:
02072544829
Email:
info@hcd.coop
Website:

No information available