Trustees WITNEY U3A
Charity number: 294071

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Wood | Chair | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Pajpai | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marion Anne Crocker | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Gardner | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Collier | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
TERRANCE MCCABE | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH HAWKINS | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marian Hannaford | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Palmer | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Kennard | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.