Financial history BRITISH SURGICAL TRADES ASSOCIATION EDUCATION AND TRAINING TRUST

Charity Number: 294114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £62.09k £57.61k £59.23k £65.32k £60.65k
Total expenditure £140.34k £94.78k £153.92k £117.89k £92.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A