ST CLEMENTS AND ST JAMES SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity pays for education and teaching expenses, establishment and management expenses of St Clement and St James CE Primary School not otherwise provided, in promoting the education, social and physical training, music and other arts for the benefit of all pupils of St Clement and St James CE Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,720 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 15 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gunnel Welford | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Ros Sacher | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Charlotte O'Brien | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bouette ex-Officio | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.85k | £48.89k | £46.49k | £45.91k | £75.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.23k | £515 | £44.36k | £25.98k | £63.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £7.50k | N/A | £3.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 291 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 291 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23RD SEPTEMBER 1985 as amended on 25 May 2024
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN ATTENDING AS PUPILS AT ST. CLEMENT'S AND ST. JAMES' CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 5 OF SCHEME.)
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST CLEMENT & ST JAMES CE PRIMARY
SCHOOL
PENZANCE PLACE
LONDON
W11 4PG
- Phone:
- 02076039225
- Email:
- info@scsj.rbkc.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window