THE PETTAUGH MISSION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evangelical outreach. Maintenance of, and new facilities at St Catherine's Church Pettaugh: Improvement of worship and meeting facilities; disabled access; heating/power provision; maintenance and improvement of adjacent Church Meadow for evangelical and secular use; all for the overall good of the local people. Expenses: the trustees do not claim or draw any expenses or costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 June 1986: Standard registration
- ST CATHERINES CHURCH HALL (Working name)
- PETTAUGH MISSION HALL DISPOSAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Herbert Trevitt | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Macdonald Taylor | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Strawson | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR JOHN MARK BULSING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RITA ELAINE DENYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.48k | £1.41k | £1.65k | £1.62k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £900 | £900 | £1.06k | £1.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1986 AS VARIED BY SCHEME SEALED 15 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 74D OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 16 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EVANGELICAL TRUTH, BOTH LOCAL AND WORLDWIDE THROUGH THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL OF SALVATION THROUGH THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND THE GIVING OF SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS OR SOCIETIES WHO PREACH SUCH EVANGELICAL TRUTH, AND B) FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND ANY BUILDINGS USED IN CONNECTION WITH THE PARISH CHURCH FOR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF ST.CATHERINE PETTAUGH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST CATHERINE, PETTAUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOAT GROVE FARM
STONHAM ASPAL ROAD
PETTAUGH
STOWMARKET
IP14 6AY
- Phone:
- 01473890263
- Email:
- rita@msdenyer.plus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window