Financial history HACKNEY ALLOTMENTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 294128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.60k £4.77k £4.67k £5.20k £5.45k
Total expenditure £1.69k £7.24k £4.92k £2.97k £4.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A