RETAINED FIREFIGHTERS UNION (R F U ) MUTUAL AID FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising to help Firefighters or their families in times of need i.e. death or hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1986: Standard registration
- 22 January 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £5 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £4.98k | £0 | £6.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 12 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 06 November 2017 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 22ND FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED 16TH MAY 1987
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FUND IS TO MAKE A GRANT SPECIFICALLY TO THE PREVIOUSLY DESIGNATED NEXT-OF-KIN OF A MEMBER ON HIS OR HER DEATH WHO IS SUFFERING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AT THAT TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window