Knebworth Womens Institute

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing women with educational opportunities and the chance to build new skills. Lectures and demonstrations to broaden knowledge and outlook of women. Take part in village , county and national events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 April 1986: Standard registration
- Knebworth Women's Institute (Working name)
- KNEBWORTH EVENING WOMENS INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Anne Compton | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bowes-Wight | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda McKnight | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Irene Lawrence | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Christeene Culley | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Margaret Hanson | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Davey | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Robertson | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Ives | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.63k | £86 | £5.61k | £9.09k | £8.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.79k | £1.48k | £4.05k | £10.53k | £6.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED) as amended on 11 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
KNEBWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 DEARDS END LANE
KNEBWORTH
SG3 6NL
- Phone:
- 01438814190
- Email:
- carole.woodman@gmail.com
- Website:
-
knebworthwi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window