STURMINSTER MARSHALL SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity number: 294178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising money from a number of small school events to provide extra equipment for the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,345
Total expenditure: £3,481

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leanna Purtill Chair 14 November 2024
None on record
Jane McDonald Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Julia Suzanne Howard Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Louise Everett Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.93k £341 £11.46k £6.07k £6.35k
Total expenditure £14.14k £8.20k £8.47k £8.71k £3.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 March 2024 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sturminster Marshall First School
78
High Street
Sturminster Marshall
Wimborne
BH21 4AY
Phone:
01258 857348
Website:

No information available