Trustees BOOKHAM LIGHT OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 294190
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SELENA JANE EDNEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith White | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Joseph Elsey | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Weiner | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Catton | Trustee | 02 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Diane Benbow | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE KAY ST JOHANSER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JENNIFER MARGARET HASTED | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.