NETA TRAINING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing training, advice and associated service to business, commerce and the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 October 1978: Standard registration
- NETA (Working name)
- NATIONAL ENGINEERING TRAINING ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Hastie | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grant Glendinning | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.80m | £2.41m | £2.45m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.60m | £1.70m | £1.83m | £97.96k | £99.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.72m | £2.16m | £2.45m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £82.26k | £249.60k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.60m | £1.52m | £1.83m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £400 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £181.23k | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH AUGUST 1967 AS AMENDED 3RD APRIL 1980, 20TH DECEMBER 1985 AND 21ST SEPTEMBER 1988 AND 27TH MARCH 1990 24TH JANUARY 2004 AND 15 DECEMBER 2006 as amended on 10 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ADEQUATE TRAINING OF PERSONS EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE. (B) SUBJECT TO THE FOREGOING OBJECT, TO EXTEND SUCH TRAINING TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stockton Riverside College
Harvard Avenue
Thornaby
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS17 6FB
- Phone:
- 01642865401
- Email:
- fiona.sharp@the-etc.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window