THE LUCY KEMP-WELCH MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are trustees of a collection of paintings by local artist Lucy Kemp-Welch. The pictures are now on loan to the local museum ( after being in store) and small contributions pay for any maintenance and insurance as required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 April 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR JOHN KEMP-WELCH | Chair |
|
||||||
NICHOLAS ANTHONY GOLD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELISABETH KEMP-WELCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £0 | £0 | £2.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.99k | £714 | £732 | £732 | £912 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST MARCH 1966
Charitable objects
I. TO ESTABLISH MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A GALLERY OR GALLERIES FOR THE PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF WORKS OF ART. II. TO PURCHASE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE ANY WORKS OF ART FOR TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT EXHIBITION IN ANY SUCH GALLERY. III. TO PROMOTE ART FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. IV. TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS FOR CARRYING OUT THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 74
Melton Court
Onslow Crescent
London
SW7 3JH
- Phone:
- 02075812164
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window