SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity Number: 294260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Shropshire Regimental Museum/Soldiers of Shropshire Museum incorporates the traditions and history of all the former Shropshire Regiments. It collects, documents, conserves, exhibits and interprets items relevant to the history of these Regiments. The Modern Army Display now includes a regularly updated display of the equipment and deployment of the successor Regiments.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £64,265
Total expenditure: £125,801

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 April 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Soldiers of Shropshire Museum (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rex Philip Sartain Chair 14 May 2019
SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM
Recently registered
COUND GUILDHALL
Received: On time
RADBROOK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PRESTFELDE SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: 75 days late
William James Nicholas Prideaux Trustee 09 September 2024
None on record
Sarah Kerr Trustee 24 July 2024
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Adams Taylor Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Major Charles Miller Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Samantha Brettell DL Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
John Villar Trustee 07 June 2023
SHROPSHIRE YEOMANRY COMRADES ASSOCIATION
Received: 10 days late
Major Charles Whitaker Trustee 14 May 2019
SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM
Recently registered
Guy Philip Chambers Trustee 14 May 2019
THE OLD ELLESMERIAN CLUB CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 1661 days
MUSEUM OF THE KING'S SHROPSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY
Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM
Recently registered
Col Francis Acton Trustee 25 August 2014
None on record
MARK JOHN GUSTAVUS HAMILTON-RUSSELL Trustee 01 June 2014
THE GEOFFREY CHARLTON WOLRYCHE WHITMORE MEMORIAL FUND
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
COL MARIUS COULON Trustee 08 October 2012
None on record
MICHAEL EVANS Trustee
SHROPSHIRE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM
Recently registered
THE HARLEY CHARITY
Received: On time
SHROPSHIRE YEOMANRY COMRADES ASSOCIATION
Received: 10 days late
THE BERWICK ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £65.88k £62.46k £109.74k £108.22k £64.27k
Total expenditure £99.69k £71.79k £108.11k £106.59k £125.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.23k N/A N/A £27.97k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Shropshire Regimental Museum
Shrewsbury Castle
Castle Gates
SHREWSBURY
SY1 2AT
Phone:
01743761598