Financial history EXETER GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 294294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £47.45k £53.89k £45.01k £41.17k £44.01k
Total expenditure £26.88k £18.38k £46.07k £28.25k £28.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £26.14k N/A N/A