1ST LITTLE STOKE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Group are as a unit of the Scout Association promoting the development of young people in achieving their full physical , intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals and as responsible citizens. Activities include arts and crafts, challenges such as orienteering, educational visits, camps, as well as group activities such as parties and family events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Rachel Husson-Smith | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Rose Oram | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Katie Leslie | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Phillips | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.76k | £21.86k | £14.84k | £11.25k | £20.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.61k | £2.82k | £14.10k | £10.92k | £21.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.77k | £3.89k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER - 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Elm Close
Little Stoke
BRISTOL
BS34 6RJ
- Phone:
- 07720484608
- Email:
- sianhusson@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window