BRITISH PSYCHOSOCIAL ONCOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BPOS promotes the advancement of education, clinical practice, and research in psychosocial oncology among those who work with people with cancer and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 May 1986: Standard registration
- BPOS (Working name)
- BRITISH PSYCHOLOGICAL ONCOLOGY GROUP (Previous name)
- BRITISH PSYCHOSOCIAL ONCOLOGY GROUP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Nick Hulbert-Williams | Chair | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rachel Taylor | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Wright | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Maria Cable | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carey Macdonald-Smith | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Baliousis | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Eila Watson | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Matheson | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Debbie Cavers | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Starkings | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Powlesland | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Lynn Calman | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof Claire Foster | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.43k | £31.51k | £3.41k | £1.82k | £3.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.38k | £25.96k | £2.67k | £3.69k | £6.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 DEC 1985 AS AMENDED ON 12 DEC 1995 AS AMENDED ON 13 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
2.1 The Society is established to advance education, clinical practice and research in psychosocial oncology and, in particular, to promote increased knowledge of this subject among professional persons who work with cancer patients and their families (the Objects).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Building 67/4061
University of Southampton
School of Health Sciences
University Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO17 1BJ
- Phone:
- 023 8059 5000
- Email:
- treasurer@bpos.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window