PLAXTOL LOCAL HISTORY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a prgramme of talks through the year on local history topics to members of the society and visitors. These will focus on Plaxtol and our surrounding area in Kent. We also carry out research. We have computerised the Plaxtol Census data from 1841 to 1911, and the church registers from the 17C to present. We are publishing a series of booklets on Victorian life in Plaxtol.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 16 June 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Goodson | Chair | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gordon McRae Wright | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Chandler | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Webb | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HEMSTED | Trustee |
|
||||||
VANESSA DUSSEK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAYDN PULESTON JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £394 | £1.26k | £1.21k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.37k | £455 | £840 | £1.22k | £2.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH APRIL 1986, AS AMENDED 10TH MAY 2005 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY DEVELOPING PUBLIC INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF LOCAL HISTORY IN PLAXTOL.
Area of benefit
PLAXTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Kingscote
Tree Lane,Plaxtol
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN15 0QA
- Phone:
- 01732810931
- Email:
- puleston@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window