GREEK CYPRIOT WOMEN'S HEALTH GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Haringey
Governance
- 20 May 1986: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- GREEK CYPRIOT WOMENS ORGANISATION - HARINGEY (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF GREEK CYPRIOT WOMEN 2. TO PROVIDE A WORKER TO CO-ORDINATE THIS PROJECT 3. TO PROVIDE AN OUTREACH WORKER TO REACH ISOLATED WOMEN AND FACILITATE THEIR PARTICIPATION IN THE PROJECT 4. TO REACH AS MANY WOMEN OF VARIOUS AGES AND AT DIFFERENT STAGES OF HEALTH NEEDS 5. TO PROVIDE A CRECHE WORKER AND FACILITIES TO ENABLE WOMEN WITH YOUNG CHILDREN TO PARTICIPATE IN THE PROJECT 6. TO ESTABLISH A SUPPORT SYSTEM AMONGST THE WOMEN AND TO INCREASE THEIR KNOWLEDGE OF AND CONFIDENCE IN THE HEALTH SYSTEM (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1-12 OF THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window