KELVIN PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kelvin Players is a non-professional theatre company whose objective is to educate the public in the arts in particular the art of drama by the presentation of dramatic productions. Mission: To create excellent theatre through the sharing and development of skills and expertise in all aspects of production and performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
207 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 07 May 1986: Standard registration
- KELVIN PLAYERS THEATRE COMPANY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Peter Rees | Chair | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brendan James O'Connor | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Corey Hawkins | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY MCCALLUM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.79k | £70.22k | £25.10k | £46.85k | £50.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.96k | £32.22k | £20.20k | £77.99k | £49.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.72k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2022
(These accounts |
30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 17/04/1986 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/1988 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/1991 AS AMENDED ON 13/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 23/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF DRAMA BY THE PRESENTATION OF DRAMATIC PRODUCTIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
253b Gloucester Road
Bishopston
Bristol
BS7 8NY
- Phone:
- 07341282714
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window