THE FAKENHAM TOWN GAS WORKS MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by providing access to and maintaining the only surviving town gasworks in England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 03 June 1986: Standard registration
- 23 March 2011: Funds received from 296035 FAKENHAM LOCAL HISTORY MUSEUM FUND
- Fakenham Gasworks Museum (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Jonathan Ezra | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Harris | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEORGE STAFFORD ACHESON | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jim Baldwin | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN LONGMUIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.83k | £10.72k | £9.02k | £3.51k | £4.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.42k | £3.47k | £4.12k | £2.62k | £2.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.71k | £9.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 April 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 April 2021 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 21 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FAKENHAM TOWN GAS WORKS MUSEUM AND ITS COLLECTIONS, AND FOR THE CONSERVATION OF THE GASWORKS BUILDINGS, STRUCTURES AND PROCESSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS STATUS AS A SCHEDULED MONUMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cottage
Dereham Road
Colkirk
FAKENHAM
Norfolk
NR21 7NQ
- Phone:
- 01553762151
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window