Governing document BRIGHTON & HOVE U3A

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AN UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 03 FEBRUARY 1986 AS AMENDED 11TH NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 16 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2019 as amended on 12 Feb 2023 as amended on 16 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BRIGHTON AND HOVE AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.