Trustees BRIGHTON & HOVE U3A
Charity number: 294373

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John McDermott | Chair | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth De Kadt | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Leach | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Lipson | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Christine Eldridge | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Barney John Johnson | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Gare | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Jean Lovie | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Anne Hart | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Mary Greenwood | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Leigh Walden | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.