GLOUCESTERSHIRE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performs concerts of classical music throughout Gloucestershire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 June 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Margaret Greenwell | Chair | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Binns | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Curtis | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Andre Curtis | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Helen Elizabeth Calder | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Damian Kenny | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Viv Hargreaves | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Williams | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.21k | £3.83k | £13.87k | £12.69k | £13.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.60k | £2.98k | £15.46k | £12.52k | £12.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 28TH NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC AND ITS PERFORMANCE IN PUBLIC AT AS HIGH A STANDARD AS CAN REASONABLEY BE ATTAINED, IN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING ORCHESTRAL MUSIC.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gloucestershire Academy Of Music
Barbican House
31 Barbican Road
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2JF
- Phone:
- 01452 668592
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window