Financial history THE JAPANESE WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity Number: 294386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £7.73k £4.20k £5.68k £4.48k £11.53k
Total expenditure £6.87k £5.80k £6.45k £8.97k £16.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A