Financial history THE SUMMIT TRUST

Charity Number: 294392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.10k £3.12k £6.04k £7.12k £7.90k
Total expenditure £3.85k £3.29k £5.72k £6.66k £8.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A