THE SOUTH INDIAN MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity represents and provide social and welfare assistance to the South Indian Muslims in the UK. Most of its members live in and around Croydon, south London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 19 May 1986: Standard registration
- THE SOUTH INDIAN MUSLIM ASSOCIATION (UK) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arifa Beevi Mohmed Ismail | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAINAFA BEEVI ABDUL RAHIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR U K THAJUDEEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.14k | £7.87k | £7.30k | £7.31k | £7.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.24k | £8.79k | £2.83k | £8.42k | £2.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1280 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MAY 1986 AS AMENDED 26TH JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND CULTURE.(2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONG MEMBERS OF THE SOUTH INDIAN MUSLIM COMMUNITY, PARTICULARY CONCERNING GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN A MULTI-RACIAL SOCIETY WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS AND ETHNICAL MINORITIES.(3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE SOUTH INDIAN MUSLIM COMMUNITY, AND (4) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITY AND LOYALTY TO MANKIND SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 PEMDEVON ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 3QQ
- Phone:
- 02086894486
- Email:
- info@simwa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window